+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On September 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 189 Yeas 59 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
- Returned to Senate
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 140 yeas 22 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 06/18/2019
- Read a first time
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor