+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0073'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 7/11/2017 @ 1:10 pm
- Approved by governor 7/11/2017 @ 11:55 am
- Presented to governor 6/28/2017 @ 12:18 pm
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 215 Yeas 103 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/17/2017
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 192 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator judith emmons
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor