+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/12/2013
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 348 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
- Introduced by senator rick jones
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor