+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/18/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 58 yeas 27 nays 11 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator erika geiss