+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0136'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 5/26/2016 @ 11:04 am
- Approved by governor 5/25/2016 @ 8:38 pm
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 5/20/2016 @ 1:44 pm
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 263 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 268 Yeas 100 Nays 8
- Read a third time
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/18/2015
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 330 yeas 32 nays 5 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor