+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/04/2019
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 322 yeas 32 nays 4 excused 2 not voting 0
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator peter j. lucido
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor