+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0004'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 01/27/2020 03:00 pm
- Approved by governor 01/24/2020 10:37 am
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 01/14/2020 10:28 am
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 3 yeas 32 nays 5 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-3) concurred in
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 98 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On September 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 09/05/2019
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 194 yeas 32 nays 6 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1) as amended
- Substitute (s-1) as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1) and amendment(s)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor