+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0119'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 9/20/2017 @ 1:55 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 9/20/2017 @ 2:28 pm
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 9/20/2017 @ 8:00 am
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Referred to second reading
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 271 Yeas 62 Nays 45
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Passed roll call # 337 yeas 23 nays 12 excused 3 not voting 0
On September 14, 2017 in the House:
- Received on 09/14/2017
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3 as amended
- Substitute s-3 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3 and amendment(s)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
- Introduced by senator david robertson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor