+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0035'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 3/8/2016 @ 2:14 pm
- Approved by governor 3/8/2016 @ 10:30 am
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 3/3/2016 @ 4:44 pm
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 79 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 61 Yeas 103 Nays 0
- Amended
- Read a third time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
On October 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received on 10/15/2015
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 437 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2 as amended
- Substitute s-2 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2 and amendment(s)
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator judith emmons