+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 110'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 9/24/2013 @ 1:40 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 9/24/2013 @ 2:36 pm
On September 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 9/17/2013 @ 2:07 pm
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- House inserted full title
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 271 Yeas 106 Nays 2
- Inserted full title
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Substitute s-4 adopted
- Passed roll call # 269 yeas 26 nays 12 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading
- Received on 06/13/2013
- Read a first time
- Rule suspended
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor