+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0003'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 01/24/2020 10:35 am
- Filed with secretary of state 01/27/2020 02:58 pm
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 01/14/2020 10:26 am
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 1 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-1) concurred in
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Title amended
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 90 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Passed roll call # 217 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 09/19/2019
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Tourism
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
- Introduced by senator jeremy moss
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor