+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/10/2021
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 440 yeas 20 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections
- Introduced by senator kevin daley
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor