+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0038'21 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 07/01/2021 01:14 pm
- Approved by governor 07/01/2021 10:30 am
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 06/24/2021 03:38 pm
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 342 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 04/29/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 111 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator roger victory
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor