+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0120'19 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 11/15/2019 09:26 am
- Approved by governor 11/14/2019 01:43 pm
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 11/04/2019 02:15 pm
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 284 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Outdoor Recreation
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/04/2019
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 189 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on environmental quality
- Introduced by senator kim lasata
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor