+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/17/2016 @ 1:18 pm
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0185'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/21/2016 @ 11:34 am
- Approved by governor 6/20/2016 @ 9:28 pm
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 475 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 425 Yeas 105 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/14/2015
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 175 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator john proos
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor