+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0188'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 11/16/2015 @ 1:36 pm
- Approved by governor 11/16/2015 @ 10:04 am
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 11/9/2015 @ 10:56 am
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 468 yeas 35 nays 1 excused 2 not voting 0
- House substitute h-3 concurred in
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 78 Nays 27
- Read a third time
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 not adopted
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/13/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 166 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on outdoor recreation and tourism
- Introduced by senator dale zorn