+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/19/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 56 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator mike nofs
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor