+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 01/28/2016
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 10 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator rick jones