+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled out of session
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with secretary of state 9/27/2016 @ 1:52 pm
- Approved by governor 9/27/2016 @ 12:52 pm
- Presented to governor 9/23/2016 @ 12:12 pm
- Assigned pa 0284'16 with immediate effect
On September 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
- Amendment(s) adopted
- House substitute h-4 concurred in as amended
- Roll call # 517 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Given immediate effect
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Re-returned from Senate with amendment(s) to House substitute H-4 with immediate effect
- Rule suspended
- Senate amendment(s) to House substitute H-4 concurred in
- Roll Call # 478 Yeas 99 Nays 6
- Re-returned to Senate
On September 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 453 Yeas 97 Nays 7
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Received on 04/29/2015
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 117 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator wayne schmidt
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor