+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/2/2015 @ 10:44 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 750 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) adopted
- Substitute s-3 withdrawn
- Substitute s-4 offered
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received on 05/21/2014
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substitute s-4 as amended adopted
- Passed roll call # 311 yeas 32 nays 6 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed temporarily
- Substitute s-3 offered
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator tory rocca