+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/30/2020
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 375 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator dale zorn
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor