+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0252'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/28/2018 @ 2:36 pm
- Approved by governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:20 pm
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:04 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 542 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 492 Yeas 104 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/30/2017
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 102 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor