+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Conference report received in senate
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- For final disposition of budget, see hb 4328
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to conference committee
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/22/2013: Reps. Earl Poleski Eileen Kowall Fred Durhal
- Senate conferees named 05/22/2013: Sens. John Pappageorge Roger Kahn Bertram Johnson
- Re-received from Senate with notice of nonconcurrence in House substitute H-1
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/22/2013: sens. john pappageorge, roger kahn, bertram johnson
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call # 190 yeas 0 nays 38 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 nonconcurred in
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 141 Yeas 60 Nays 48
- Returned to Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading
- Motion to discharge committee approved
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Notice given to discharge committee
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received on 05/01/2013
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Passed roll call # 144 yeas 21 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
- Rules suspended
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Amendment(s) adopted
- Passed roll call # 143 yeas 23 nays 14 excused 0 not voting 0
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment(s) adopted
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator john pappageorge
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor