+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0019'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 01/27/2020 03:30 pm
- Approved by governor 01/27/2020 01:59 pm
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 01/17/2020 03:06 pm
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 6 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-3) concurred in
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Laid over one day under the rules
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 4 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 05/22/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 118 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor