+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Conference report received in senate
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- For final disposition of budget, see hb 4228
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to conference committee
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/22/2013: Reps. Bill Rogers Phil Potvin Brandon Dillon
- Senate conferees named 05/22/2013: Sens. Howard Walker Roger Kahn Hoon-Yung Hopgood
- Re-received from Senate with notice of nonconcurrence in House substitute H-1
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/22/2013: sens. howard walker, roger kahn, hoon-yung hopgood
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- House amended title
- House substitute h-1 nonconcurred in
- Roll call # 180 yeas 0 nays 38 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Title amended
- Passed Roll Call # 131 Yeas 60 Nays 48
- Read a third time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Placed on second reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Notice given to discharge committee
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 04/25/2013
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Amendment(s) adopted
- Passed roll call # 112 yeas 21 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
- Title amended
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator roger kahn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor