+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0099'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 7/2/2013 @ 3:26 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 7/2/2013 @ 4:44 pm
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/20/2013 @ 10:42 am
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 235 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-4 concurred in
- House inserted full title
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 205 Yeas 91 Nays 14
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Read a third time
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Placed on third reading
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/22/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 207 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on veterans, military affairs and homeland security
- Introduced by senator john pappageorge
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor