+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by governor 11/21/2019 10:49 am
- Filed with secretary of state 11/21/2019 04:20 pm
- Assigned pa 0132'19 with immediate effect
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 11/14/2019 01:50 pm
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 300 yeas 33 nays 3 excused 2 not voting 0
- Given immediate effect
- Ordered enrolled
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with amendment(s)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 74 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 277 yeas 21 nays 17 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 10/24/2019
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced by senator kevin daley
- Referred to committee on agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor