+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/05/2013
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 232 yeas 25 nays 13 excused 0 not voting 0
- Substitute s-1 defeated
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on reforms, restructuring and reinventing
- Introduced by senator mark jansen