+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0176'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 11/26/2013 @ 4:01 pm
- Approved by governor 11/26/2013 @ 2:38 pm
- Presented to governor 11/21/2013 @ 11:58 am
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 535 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
- House inserted full title
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 412 Yeas 106 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/14/2013
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 49 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on outdoor recreation and tourism
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson