+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0158'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 09/17/2020 11:46 am
- Approved by governor 09/17/2020 10:31 am
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 09/14/2020 01:02 pm
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 67 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On September 2, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/11/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 39 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor