+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0051'19 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 09/27/2019 01:26 pm
- Approved by governor 09/27/2019 11:33 am
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 09/16/2019 03:18 pm
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 196 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-1) concurred in
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 194 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/01/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 51 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator kevin daley
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor