+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/20/2013
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 321 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
- Introduced by senator john pappageorge
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor