+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Passed roll call # 136 yeas 26 nays 12 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received on 05/03/2017
- Read a first time
- Rule suspended
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator michael green
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor