+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0042'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 6/3/2015 @ 4:40 pm
- Approved by governor 6/3/2015 @ 9:38 am
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 5/26/2015 @ 12:51 pm
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 192 yeas 33 nays 3 excused 2 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 66 Nays 43
- Read a third time
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Substitute H-1 not adopted
- Placed on third reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Received on 03/19/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 60 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator patrick colbeck
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor