+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 05/15/2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 87 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator tom barrett
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor