+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0032'19 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 06/25/2019 09:08 am
- Filed with secretary of state 06/25/2019 10:32 am
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 06/20/2019 03:46 am
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call: roll call # 137 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-5) concurred in
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Substitute (H-5) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 95 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-5)
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-3)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 27 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 04/24/2019
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator wayne schmidt
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor