+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0042'19 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 07/08/2019 08:40 am
- Filed with secretary of state 07/08/2019 02:14 pm
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 06/25/2019 09:26 am
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call: roll call # 160 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-2) concurred in
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
- Referred to second reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 162 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
- Read a third time
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 04/18/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 21 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
- Introduced by senator curtis hertel
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor