+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 581'18 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/28/2018 @ 12:45 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/28/2018 @ 3:52 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:26 pm
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 921 yeas 22 nays 16 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
- Referred to second reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 880 Yeas 56 Nays 53
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
- Read a third time
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Passed roll call # 677 yeas 23 nays 14 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2018
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
- Introduced by senator jim stamas
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor