+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/23/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 336 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator margaret o'brien
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor