+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 580'18 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/28/2018 @ 3:50 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/28/2018 @ 12:29 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:46 pm
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 928 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/06/2018
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 716 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor