+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0275'22
- Filed with secretary of state 12/29/2022 01:42 pm
- Approved by governor 12/29/2022 01:04 pm
On December 28, 2022 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/27/2022 01:37 PM
On December 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 28, 2022 in the House:
- FULL TITLE AGREED TO
On December 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 496 Yeas 68 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 13
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Rule suspended
- Placed on second reading
On November 30, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/29/2022
On November 29, 2022 in the House:
- PASSED ROLL CALL # 487 YEAS 24 NAYS 12 EXCUSED 1 NOT VOTING 1
- PLACED ON IMMEDIATE PASSAGE
- RULES SUSPENDED
On November 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On November 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
- Introduced by senator wayne a. schmidt
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor