+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0006'2019 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 04/30/2019 10:53 am
- Filed with secretary of state 04/30/2019 11:40 am
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 04/30/2019 06:34 am
- Ordered enrolled out of session
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 71 Yeas 109 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Placed on third reading
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Ways and Means
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 18 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 04/10/2019
- Read a first time
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced by senator kenneth horn
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor