+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 631'18 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/28/2018 @ 4:41 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/28/2018 @ 6:14 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:36 pm
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Substitute H-2 not adopted
- Substitute H-5 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 976 Yeas 61 Nays 46
- Returned to Senate
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call # 1055 yeas 25 nays 12 excused 1 not voting 0
- Immediate effect defeated
- Title amendment agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Title amended
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2018
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 676 yeas 23 nays 14 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
- Introduced by senator thomas casperson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor