+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0335'20 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/29/2020 12:34 PM
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/29/2020 03:22 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/21/2020 03:54 pm
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 537 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2020
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 444 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor