+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Postponed for the day
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrollment vacated
- Postponed for the day
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 420 Yeas 88 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-6)
- Referred to second reading
- Substitute (H-6) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Read a second time
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator removed as sponsor: ruth a. johnson
- Roll call: roll call # 349 yeas 31 nays 6 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-6) concurred in
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 290 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/30/2019
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections
- Introduced by senator ruth johnson
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor