+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0408'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 12/19/2018 @ 3:22 pm
- Approved by governor 12/19/2018 @ 11:53 am
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:44 pm
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 786 Yeas 104 Nays 2
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/29/2018
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 642 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator joe hune
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor