+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/2/2015 @ 10:42 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 744 Yeas 104 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Placed on third reading
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read a first time
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 766 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Received on 12/11/2014
- Referred to Committee on Education
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on education
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator mark jansen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor