+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0049'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 6/8/2017 @ 10:50 am
- Filed with secretary of state 6/9/2017 @ 9:12 am
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/6/2017 @ 12:32 pm
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- House amendment(s) concurred in roll call # 180 yeas 31 nays 6 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Enrollment vacated
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 97 Yeas 83 Nays 24
- Read a third time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Received on 02/22/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 38 yeas 29 nays 5 excused 4 not voting 0
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
- Introduced by senator peter macgregor
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor