+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- POCKET VETO 01/05/2021
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:31 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Roll call: roll call # 589 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-3) concurred in
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) not adopted
- Substitute (H-3) adopted and amended
- Read a second time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 565 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Read a first time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2020
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 433 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On November 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor