+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2020
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 465 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
- Introduced by senator kimberly a. lasata
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor